KY HB36 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-5)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-25 - posted in committee
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS Chapter 411 to provide civil immunity for damaging a vehicle if a person enters the vehicle with the reasonable, good-faith belief that a dog or cat is in immediate danger of death if not removed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to the safety of canines and felines.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-25Houseposted in committee
2019-01-10Houseto Judiciary (H)
2019-01-08Houseintroduced in House
2018-08-15HousePrefiled by the sponsor(s).

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback