KY HB359 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-08 - 2nd reading, to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-08 - 2nd reading, to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 198B.658 to make the experience equivalent for in-state and out-of-state work when applying for a journeyman or master HVAC license.
Title
AN ACT relating to the licensure of HVAC professionals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-08 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-03-07 | Senate | floor amendments (1-title), (2) and (3) filed |
2017-03-07 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2017-02-28 | Senate | to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S) |
2017-02-28 | Senate | received in Senate |
2017-02-27 | House | 3rd reading, passed 93-0 |
2017-02-23 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 27, 2017 |
2017-02-23 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-02-22 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2017-02-17 | House | posted in committee |
2017-02-15 | House | to Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs (H) |
2017-02-14 | House | introduced in House |