KY HB356 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 181)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 181)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 17.545 to prohibit a sex offender registrant who is 18 years of age or older and has committed a criminal offense against a victim who is a minor from having the same residence as a minor; provide an exception if the registrant is the minor's spouse, parent, grandparent, stepparent, sibling, stepsibling, or court-appointed guardian of the minor, unless the minor was a victim of the registrant.
Title
AN ACT relating to sex offender registrants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 761 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 357 (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 357 (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 181) |
2018-04-14 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2018-04-14 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2018-04-14 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2018-04-14 | Senate | floor amendment (1) and (2-title) filed |
2018-04-14 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 |
2018-04-13 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Saturday, April 14, 2018 |
2018-03-29 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-03-27 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2018-03-21 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2018-03-20 | Senate | received in Senate |
2018-03-19 | House | 3rd reading, passed 86-0 |
2018-03-16 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 19, 2018 |
2018-03-15 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-03-14 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2018-02-20 | House | posted in committee |
2018-02-14 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2018-02-12 | House | introduced in House |