KY HB353 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-18 - to Health & Welfare (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-18 - to Health & Welfare (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 205.560 to add amino acid-based elemental formula to the list of medicines covered by the Cabinet for Health and Family Services for treatment of inborn errors of metabolism or genetic conditions; amend KRS 213.141 to add amino acid-based elemental formula to the list of therapeutic foods supplied by the Division of Maternal and Child Health; amend KRS 304.17A-258 to add health benefit plan coverage for amino acid-based elemental formula; apply the health benefit plan requirement to policies issued or renewed on or after the effective date of this Act; declare short title to be "Noah's Law."
Title
AN ACT relating to health benefit coverage of amino acid-based elemental formula.
Sponsors
Rep. Gregory Stumbo [D] | Rep. Regina Huff [R] | Rep. Leslie Combs [D] | Rep. Jeff Greer [D] |
Rep. Chris Harris [D] | Rep. Dennis Keene [D] | Rep. Charles Miller [D] | Rep. Rick Nelson [D] |
Rep. Jody Richards [D] | Rep. John Short [D] | Rep. Rita Smart [D] | Rep. David Watkins [D] |
Rep. Susan Westrom [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-18 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2016-02-16 | Senate | received in Senate |
2016-02-12 | House | 3rd reading, passed 92-0 |
2016-02-11 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day |
2016-02-11 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 16, 2016 |
2016-02-11 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-02-10 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2016-02-09 | House | posting waived |
2016-02-09 | House | to Banking & Insurance (H) |
2016-02-08 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/HB353.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/HB353/bill.pdf |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/HB353/vote_history.pdf |