KY HB347 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-15 - recommitted to Agriculture & Small Business (H)
Pending: House Agriculture and Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]

Summary

Amend KRS 321.185 to provide that veterinarians who report suspected animal cruelty cases are not in violation of client/patient confidentiality requirements contained in the statute.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to veterinarians.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-02-15 recommitted to Agriculture & Small Business (H)
2011-02-15 taken from the Regular Orders of the Day
2011-02-10 posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 11, 2011
2011-02-10 2nd reading, to Rules
2011-02-09 reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with committee amendment (1)
2011-02-07 posted in committee
2011-02-07 to Agriculture & Small Business (H)
2011-02-04 introduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback