KY HB346 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - returned to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S)
Pending: Senate Licensing, Occupations & Administrative Regulations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 309.350 to define "animal massage therapist", "massage establishment", and "practice of animal massage therapy"; create a new section of KRS 309.350 to 309.364 to allow a veterinarian holding a license in good standing to perform animal massage therapy as part of the practice for which he or she is licensed; allow a veterinarian technician holding a license in good standing to perform animal massage therapy as part of the practice for which he or she is licensed; prohibit a person from practicing animal massage therapy unless he or she has met certain educational and licensure requirements; prohibit a person from holding himself or herself out to be an animal massage therapist unless he or she has met the educational and licensure requirements; require approved animal massage therapy training programs to hold an accreditation recognized by the United States Department of Education; establish the conditions upon which a person may be granted a license as a large or small animal massage therapist; establish the conditions upon which the board may grant an animal massage therapy license; require an animal massage therapist to report to the animal's owner or representative any findings that indicate an examination by a licensed veterinarian; require an animal massage therapist to provide notification of the results of the treatment and summary of observations of the animal's condition; amend KRS 309.351 to allow licensed massage therapists to use pulsed electromagnetic field therapy or microcurrent devices for which they are trained; amend KRS 309.354 to remove the requirement for a massage school owner or director to be a member of the board; require the chair to appoint an advisory committee to the board; allow members of the committee to present new items to be considered for the board agenda to the board chair; amend KRS 309.355 to allow the board to fine any massage establishment that employs or contracts with unlicensed practitioners who perform massages; allow the board to fine any massage establishment that fails to report to the board any license massage therapist who violates KRS Chapter 309.350 to 309.364 or administrative regulations promulgated by the board while employed by the massage establishment; give the board the authority to hire staff for the work of the board; amend KRS 309.357 to remove the list of existing fees from statute and charge the board to promulgate administrative regulations that establish a reasonable schedule of fees and charges for the issuance and restoration of licenses and certificates and for the renewal of licenses; establish the conditions under which a license may be reinstated or renewed; amend KRS 309.358 to add background checks conducted by the Kentucky State Police and the Federal Bureau of Investigation as a requirement for licensure; allow licensure to be obtained through an associate's degree if the program meets the requirements of a training program approved by the board; amend KRS 309.361 to require licensees to complete 12 hours of continuing education instead of 24 as a condition of licensure renewal; require 3 of the 12 hours of continuing education to be completed in ethics; amend KRS 309.362 to increase the cap on fines from $500 to $1,000 per violation for repeat offenders; amend KRS 309.363 to require the board to accept the Federation of State Massage Therapy Boards' guidelines in approving continuing education; amend KRS 309.3631 to require applications for the initial certificate of good standing and annual renewals to be submitted with a fee prescribed by the board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to massage therapy.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 199 (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-18Senatereturned to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S)
2020-03-18Senate2nd reading
2020-03-18Senatetaken from Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S)
2020-03-17Senateto Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S)
2020-03-17Senate1st reading
2020-03-17Senatetaken from Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S)
2020-03-12Senateto Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S)
2020-03-10Senatereceived in Senate
2020-03-09House3rd reading, passed 90-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
2020-03-05Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 6, 2020
2020-03-05House2nd reading, to Rules
2020-03-04Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2020-02-27Houseposted in committee
2020-01-31Houseto Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs (H)
2020-01-29Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback