KY HB345 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 180)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 180)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 304.10-030 to include certain types of disability insurance in the definition of "nonadmitted insurance"; amend KRS 304.10-040 to allow licensed agents with lines of authority in health and life to export disability insurance; amend KRS 304.120 to a broker procuring surplus lines disability coverage maintain his or her agent license with lines of authority for health and life; amend KRS 304.10-180 to remove reference to Surplus Lines Insurance Multi-State Compliance Compact Commission; repeal KRS 304.10-400.
Title
AN ACT relating to surplus lines.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 523 (Y: 83 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SCS 1 RSN# 771 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 178 (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 177 (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SCS 1 RSN# 771 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 178 (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 177 (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 180) |
2018-04-14 | House | delivered to Governor |
2018-04-14 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2018-04-14 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2018-04-14 | House | passed 83-2 |
2018-04-14 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2018-04-14 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2018-04-14 | House | taken from Rules |
2018-04-14 | House | to Rules (H) |
2018-04-14 | House | received in House |
2018-04-14 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2018-04-14 | Senate | placed in the Consent Orders of the Day for Saturday, April 14, 2018 |
2018-04-14 | Senate | to Senate Floor |
2018-04-14 | Senate | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2018-03-22 | Senate | reassigned to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2018-03-21 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-03-20 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2018-02-27 | Senate | to Banking & Insurance (S) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | received in Senate |
2018-02-23 | House | 3rd reading, passed 83-0 with Committee Substitute |
2018-02-22 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 23, 2018 |
2018-02-16 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-02-15 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2018-02-12 | House | posted in committee |
2018-02-12 | House | to Banking & Insurance (H) |
2018-02-08 | House | introduced in House |