KY HB345 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-23 - posted in committee
Pending: House Agriculture and Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-23 - posted in committee
Pending: House Agriculture and Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 139.480 to exempt from sales and use tax the sale or purchase of float bed trays on or after July 1, 2015, through June 30, 2019; EFFECTIVE July 1, 2015.
Title
AN ACT relating to sales and use tax on float bed trays.
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Quarles [R] | Rep. Richard Heath [R] | Rep. Michael Meredith [R] | Rep. Jonathan Shell [R] |
Rep. James Tipton [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-23 | House | posted in committee |
2015-02-09 | House | to Agriculture & Small Business (H) |
2015-02-06 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/HB345.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/HB345/bill.doc |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/HB345/FN.doc |