KY HB342 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - to Education (S)
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - to Education (S)
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 156.111 to expand the number of components within the superintendents training and assessment program; require superintendents hired on or after July 1, 2012, to complete the program within two years; require Kentucky Board of Education to adopt administrative regulations to govern the program; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to training and assessment of new superintendents, and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-14 | to Education (S) | |
2012-02-10 | received in Senate | |
2012-02-10 | 3rd reading, passed 94-0 with Committee Substitute | |
2012-02-08 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 10, 2012 | |
2012-02-08 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2012-02-07 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute | |
2012-02-02 | posted in committee | |
2012-01-31 | to Education (H) | |
2012-01-30 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB342.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB342/bill.doc |