KY HB341 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 107)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 107)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 186.164 to increase the special license plate fee; require a group to submit programming and production costs to the cabinet; require a group to maintain a minimum number of registrations annually; require an applicant for a special license plate to make a contribution; amend KRS 186.172 to require a contribution on special firefighter license plates; amend KRS 186.174 to include conditions for the issuance of personalized license plates; repeal KRS 186.167, relating to voluntary contributions on Masonic Order license plates.
Title
AN ACT relating to special license plates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 352 (Y: 79 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs 1 RSN# 999 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 86 (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs 1 RSN# 999 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 86 (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | House | signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 107) |
2019-03-14 | House | delivered to Governor |
2019-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2019-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2019-03-14 | House | passed 79-10 |
2019-03-14 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-03-14 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-03-14 | House | to Rules (H) |
2019-03-14 | House | received in House |
2019-03-14 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-03-13 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2019-03-12 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2019-03-07 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2019-03-07 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 7, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) as a consent bill |
2019-03-05 | Senate | returned to Transportation (S) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | 1st reading |
2019-03-05 | Senate | taken from Transportation (S) |
2019-02-26 | Senate | to Transportation (S) |
2019-02-22 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-02-21 | House | 3rd reading, passed 99-1 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-02-20 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 21, 2019 |
2019-02-20 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-19 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-02-15 | House | posted in committee |
2019-02-14 | House | to Transportation (H) |
2019-02-13 | House | introduced in House |