KY HB340 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 74)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]

Summary

Amend KRS 148.542 to add definitions for "enhanced incentive county," "Kentucky-based company," and "resident"; amend KRS 148.544 to establish thresholds for Kentucky-based companies to qualify for the film tax credit incentives and lower the thresholds for all other companies; increase current incentives for a motion picture or entertainment production filmed or produced in a county other than an enhanced incentive county and further increase the incentives for those productions filmed or produced in an enhanced incentive county; amend KRS 148.546 to require additional information to be included on the application for the incentives, incentive agreement, and cost report; apply to taxable periods beginning on or after January 1, 2015.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to the expansion of the film tax credits.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-30Housesigned by Governor (Acts, ch. 74)
2015-03-23Housedelivered to Governor
2015-03-23Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2015-03-11Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2015-03-11Housereceived in House
2015-03-11Senatepassed 28-8
2015-03-11Senatecommittee amendment (1-title) withdrawn
2015-03-11SenateCommittee Substitute withdrawn
2015-03-11Senate3rd reading
2015-03-11Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 11, 2015
2015-03-10Senatereported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) as a Consent Bill
2015-03-09Senatereturned to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
2015-03-09Senate1st reading
2015-03-09Senatetaken from Appropriations & Revenue (S)
2015-02-19Senateto Appropriations & Revenue (S)
2015-02-13Senatereceived in Senate
2015-02-12House3rd reading, passed 96-0
2015-02-11Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 12, 2015
2015-02-11House2nd reading, to Rules
2015-02-10Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2015-02-09Houseposting waived
2015-02-09Houseto Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2015-02-06Houseintroduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback