KY HB334 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 179)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriate funds for the payment of claims against the Commonwealth; APPROPRIATION; EMERGENCY.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT authorizing the payment of certain claims against the state which have been duly audited and approved according to law, and have not been paid because of the lapsing or insufficiency of former appropriations against which the claims were chargeable, or the lack of an appropriate procurement document in place, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 754 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 263 (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-26Housesigned by Governor (Acts, ch. 179)
2018-04-14Housedelivered to Governor
2018-04-14Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2018-04-14Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2018-04-14Housereceived in House
2018-04-14Senate3rd reading, passed 38-0
2018-04-13Senatepassed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day
2018-04-02Senatepassed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day
2018-03-29Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, April 2, 2018
2018-03-27Senatereported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill
2018-03-22Senatereturned to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
2018-03-22Senate1st reading
2018-03-22Senatetaken from Appropriations & Revenue (S)
2018-03-13Senateto Appropriations & Revenue (S)
2018-03-12Senatereceived in Senate
2018-03-09House3rd reading, passed 84-0
2018-03-08Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 9, 2018
2018-03-07House2nd reading, to Rules
2018-03-06Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2018-02-22Houseposted in committee
2018-02-12Houseto Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2018-02-08Houseintroduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback