KY HB333 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Passed on April 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 168)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 218A.010 to define "fentanyl," "carfentanil," and "fentanyl derivatives"; amend KRS 218A.020 to expand the authority of the Office of Drug Control Policy to request the rescheduling of a substance; amend KRS 218A.050 to schedule fentanyl derivatives as Schedule I controlled substances; amend KRS 218A.1410 to include carfentanil, fentanyl, or fentanyl derivatives; amend KRS 218A.1412 to make trafficking in any amount of fentanyl, carfentanil, or fentanyl derivatives subject to elevated penalties; amend KRS 218A.142 to include carfentanil, fentanyl, or fentanyl derivatives; amend KRS 218A.205 to require state licensing boards to promulgate regulations limiting prescriptions for Schedule II controlled substances for acute pain to a three day supply, with certain exceptions; create a new section of KRS Chapter 218A to create a new offense of trafficking in a misrepresented controlled substance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to controlled substances.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-10Housesigned by Governor (Acts, ch. 168)
2017-03-30Housedelivered to Governor
2017-03-30Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2017-03-30Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2017-03-30HouseBill passed 80-6
2017-03-30HouseHouse concurred in Senate Committee Substitute
2017-03-30Houseposted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute
2017-03-30Houseto Rules (H)
2017-03-30Housereceived in House
2017-03-30Senate3rd reading, passed 29-9 with Committee Substitute
2017-03-30Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 30, 2017
2017-03-30Senatereported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute
2017-03-07Senatereturned to Judiciary (S)
2017-03-07Senate2nd reading
2017-03-07Senatetaken from Judiciary (S)
2017-03-06Senatereturned to Judiciary (S)
2017-03-06Senate1st reading
2017-03-06Senatetaken from Judiciary (S)
2017-03-01Senateto Judiciary (S)
2017-02-28Senatereceived in Senate
2017-02-28House3rd reading, passed 96-1 with floor amendment (3)
2017-02-27Housefloor amendment (3) filed
2017-02-23Housefloor amendment (2) filed
2017-02-23Housefloor amendment (1) withdrawn
2017-02-21Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 23, 2017
2017-02-17House2nd reading, to Rules
2017-02-16Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2017-02-15Housefloor amendment (1) filed
2017-02-14Houseposted in committee
2017-02-14Houseto Judiciary (H)
2017-02-13Houseintroduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback