KY HB331 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
Pending: Senate Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
Pending: Senate Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 40.315 to remove the residency requirement for interment in veteran cemeteries.
Title
AN ACT relating to veteran cemeteries.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 187 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | Senate | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | received in Senate |
2022-02-28 | House | 3rd reading, passed 96-0 |
2022-02-22 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 23, 2022 |
2022-02-16 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-02-15 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2022-02-11 | House | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (H) |
2022-01-20 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-01-20 | House | introduced in House |