KY HB331 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-28 - became law without Governor's Signature (Acts Ch. 144)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 156.132 to eliminate the ability of the commissioner of education or the Kentucky Board of Education to remove a local school board member; amend KRS 156.136, KRS 158.785, KRS 160.345, KRS 160.470, and KRS 160.1592 to conform.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to removal of local school board members.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1768 (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 123 (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-28Housebecame law without Governor's Signature (Acts Ch. 144)
2021-03-16Housedelivered to Governor
2021-03-16Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2021-03-16Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2021-03-16Housereceived in House
2021-03-16Senate3rd reading, passed 30-6
2021-03-16Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 16, 2021
2021-03-16Senatereported favorably, to Rules
2021-03-12Senatereturned to Education (S)
2021-03-12Senate2nd reading
2021-03-12Senatetaken from Education (S)
2021-03-11Senatereturned to Education (S)
2021-03-11Senate1st reading
2021-03-11Senatetaken from Education (S)
2021-03-01Senateto Education (S)
2021-02-26Senateto Committee on Committees (S)
2021-02-26Senatereceived in Senate
2021-02-25House3rd reading, passed 92-3
2021-02-24Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 25, 2021
2021-02-24House2nd reading, to Rules
2021-02-23Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2021-02-10Houseposted in committee
2021-02-10Houseto Education (H)
2021-02-02Houseto Committee on Committees (H)
2021-02-02Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback