KY HB331 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-10 - to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S)
Pending: Senate Licensing, Occupations & Administrative Regulations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-10 - to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S)
Pending: Senate Licensing, Occupations & Administrative Regulations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 244.085 to allow a person who is 18 to 21 years of age and employed as a musician or technician with a band or musical group to remain on the premises where alcoholic beverages are sold or consumed if the band or group has a verbal or written contract to perform on that date; specify while on the premises the underage person shall wear identification that he or she is underage.
Title
AN ACT relating to musical performances.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-10 | to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S) | |
2012-02-08 | received in Senate | |
2012-02-07 | 3rd reading, passed 81-17 | |
2012-02-02 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 7, 2012 | |
2012-02-02 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2012-02-01 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2012-01-30 | posted in committee | |
2012-01-30 | to Licensing & Occupations (H) | |
2012-01-26 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB331.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB331/bill.doc |