KY HB33 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-06 - to Transportation (S)
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-06 - to Transportation (S)
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 189.292, prohibiting texting while driving, to prohibit the entering of a telephone number or name into a personal communication device in order to place a call while driving a vehicle in a highway work zone or school zone; amend KRS 189.990(30) to make technical corrections; increase the fines for violations of Section 1 of the Act and KRS 189.294 to $50 for the first offense and $100 for subsequent offenses; direct that 50% of the fines collected for violations of these offenses be directed to the Kentucky Injury Prevention and Research Center at the University of Kentucky and appropriate the funds for the purpose of injury prevention research; APPROPRIATION.
Title
AN ACT relating to injury prevention and making an appropriation therefore.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-06 | Senate | to Transportation (S) |
2014-03-04 | Senate | received in Senate |
2014-02-28 | House | 3rd reading, passed 62-32 with floor amendment (1) |
2014-02-27 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2014-02-26 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day |
2014-02-26 | House | taken from Rules |
2014-02-26 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-02-25 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1) |
2014-02-19 | House | posted in committee |
2014-01-07 | House | to Transportation (H) |
2014-01-07 | House | introduced in House |
2014-10-02 | House | To: Interim Joint Committee on Transportation |