KY HB324 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 78)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 78)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 95A.070 to provide a consumer price index adjustment to the health and life insurance supplement that the state pays to firefighters, as defined in KRS 61.315, who are permanently and totally disabled in the line of duty.
Title
AN ACT relating to payments for firefighters permanently and totally disabled in the line of duty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 78) | |
2012-03-30 | delivered to Governor | |
2012-03-30 | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate | |
2012-03-29 | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House | |
2012-03-28 | received in House | |
2012-03-28 | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 | |
2012-03-28 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 28, 2012 | |
2012-03-23 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2012-03-22 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2012-02-29 | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) | |
2012-02-24 | received in Senate | |
2012-02-23 | 3rd reading, passed 94-0 with committee amendment (1-title), floor amendment (1) | |
2012-02-16 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 21, 2012 | |
2012-02-16 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2012-02-15 | floor amendment (1) filed | |
2012-02-15 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with committee amendment (1-title) | |
2012-02-02 | posted in committee | |
2012-01-30 | to Local Government (H) | |
2012-01-26 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB324.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB324/bill.doc |