KY HB32 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (2) and committee amendment (2-title)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 138.130 to define terms; amend KRS 138.140 to impose an excise tax on vapor products; amend KRS 138.143 to impose a floor stock tax; EFFECTIVE 11:59 p.m. on July 31, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to the taxation of tobacco products.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1450 (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 149 (Y: 75 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-15Houseposted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (2) and committee amendment (2-title)
2020-04-15Housetaken from Rules
2020-04-15Houseto Rules (H)
2020-04-15Housereceived in House
2020-04-15Senatepassed 24-10 with Committee Substitute (2) and committee amendment (2-title)
2020-04-15Senatecommittee amendment (1-title) withdrawn
2020-04-15Senatefloor amendments (1) (2) and (3) withdrawn
2020-04-15SenateCommittee Substitute (1) withdrawn
2020-04-15Senate3rd reading
2020-04-15Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, April 15, 2020
2020-04-15Senatereported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (2) and committee amendment (2-title)
2020-04-14Senaterecommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
2020-03-19Senatefloor amendments (1), (2) and (3) filed to Committee Substitute
2020-03-19Senatereported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title)
2020-03-18Senatereturned to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
2020-03-18Senate1st reading
2020-03-18Senatetaken from Appropriations & Revenue (S)
2020-03-02Senateto Appropriations & Revenue (S)
2020-02-27Senatereceived in Senate
2020-02-26House3rd reading, passed 75-17 with Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (1)
2020-02-21Housefloor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
2020-02-20Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 21, 2020
2020-02-12House2nd reading, to Rules
2020-02-11Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2020-01-14Houseposted in committee
2020-01-07Houseto Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2020-01-07Houseintroduced in House
2019-08-21HousePrefiled by the sponsor(s).

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback