KY HB32 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-28 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS 18A.225 to 18A.2287 to require the Personnel Cabinet to establish a pilot program to improve the health and wellness outcomes of state employees; require the pilot program to provide a reduced monthly cost for a fully insured health benefit plan or self-insured plan offered by the Public Employee Health Insurance Program to an employee who participates in wellness activities; require the wellness activities to be approved by the cabinet; require the cabinet to determine the amount of the reduced monthly cost and the level of participation required to qualify for the reduced cost; establish that the pilot program is to be in effect January 1, 2012 to December 31, 2015; require the Cabinet to submit an annual report on the results of the pilot program on or before December 1.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to state employee health insurance.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-02-28 to State & Local Government (S)
2011-02-24 received in Senate
2011-02-23 3rd reading, passed 99-0 with Committee Substitute
2011-02-22 posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 23, 2011
2011-02-18 2nd reading, to Rules
2011-02-17 reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute
2011-02-08 posted in committee
2011-01-04 to State Government (H)
2011-01-04 introduced in House
2011-10-06 To: Interim Joint Committee on State Government

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback