KY HB318 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-12 - returned to Banking & Insurance (H)
Pending: House Banking and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-12 - returned to Banking & Insurance (H)
Pending: House Banking and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS 304.17A-600 to 304.17A-633 to require insurers of health benefit plans to offer a program to reduce or eliminate prior authorization requirements; establish notice requirements; establish participating provider requirements; provide that the Act applies to health benefit plans issued or renewed on or after January 1, 2026.
Title
AN ACT relating to prior authorization.
Sponsors
Rep. Matt Lockett [R] | Rep. Josh Bray [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | House | returned to Banking & Insurance (H) |
2024-03-12 | House | 2nd reading |
2024-03-12 | House | taken from Banking & Insurance (H) |
2024-03-11 | House | returned to Banking & Insurance (H) |
2024-03-11 | House | 1st reading |
2024-03-11 | House | taken from Banking & Insurance (H) |
2024-01-30 | House | to Banking & Insurance (H) |
2024-01-22 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-01-22 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Actuarial Analysis
Health and Medical Services
Health Benefit Mandate
Hospitals and Nursing Homes
Insurance, Health
Local Mandate
Physicians and Practitioners
Health and Medical Services
Health Benefit Mandate
Hospitals and Nursing Homes
Insurance, Health
Local Mandate
Physicians and Practitioners