KY HB316 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-15 - returned to Rules (S)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 158.148 to define bullying; require a school board's code of acceptable behavior to prohibit bullying; require the code to include procedures for investigating and responding to reports of bullying and a method to protect a person reporting a bullying incident.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to the safety and well-being of students.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-15Senatereturned to Rules (S)
2016-04-15Senatetaken from Education (S)
2016-04-15Senaterecommitted to State & Local Government (S)
2016-04-01Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2016-04-01Senatetaken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day
2016-03-29Senatepassed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day
2016-03-28Senatepassed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day
2016-03-28Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 28, 2016 (Consent Orders #2)
2016-03-23Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2016-03-22Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2016-02-16Senateto Education (S)
2016-02-12Senatereceived in Senate
2016-02-11House3rd reading, passed 94-1 with floor amendment (1)
2016-02-10Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 11, 2016
2016-02-10Housefloor amendment (1) filed
2016-02-10House2nd reading, to Rules
2016-02-09Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2016-02-04Houseposted in committee
2016-02-01Houseto Education (H)
2016-01-28Houseintroduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback