KY HB315 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 91)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]

Summary

Amend KRS 189.125, relating to vehicle occupant restraints, to require booster seats to be used by children who are less than nine years old and are between 40 and 57 inches in height; clarify that a child of any age who is over 57 inches in height shall not be required to be secured in a booster seat.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to the protection of children in motor vehicles.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-30Housesigned by Governor (Acts, ch. 91)
2015-03-25Housedelivered to Governor
2015-03-25Houseenrolled, signed by each presiding officer
2015-03-24HouseBill passed 69-27
2015-03-24HouseHouse concurred in Senate Committee Substitute
2015-03-24Houseposted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute
2015-03-24Houseto Rules (H)
2015-03-24Housereceived in House
2015-03-24Senate3rd reading, passed 33-5 with Committee Substitute
2015-03-24Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 24, 2015
2015-03-11Senatereported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute as a Consent Bill
2015-03-10Senatereturned to Transportation (S)
2015-03-10Senate1st reading
2015-03-10Senatetaken from Transportation (S)
2015-03-03Senateto Transportation (S)
2015-03-02Senatereceived in Senate
2015-02-27House3rd reading, passed 61-26
2015-02-25Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 27, 2015
2015-02-25House2nd reading, to Rules
2015-02-24Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2015-02-12Houseposted in committee
2015-02-09Houseto Transportation (H)
2015-02-05Houseintroduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback