KY HB313 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-26 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-26 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 7.110 to require that statutorily mandated reports submitted to the Commission be posted and archived in an electronic database accessible to members of the General Assembly and to staff; require that reports be archived in a specific way; require committee staff to attach a list of recent reports to meeting agenda when Commission refers reports to committee; require Commission to evaluate the necessity and content of the reports every five years and to make recommendations to the General Assembly if statutory changes are needed regarding any reporting requirements; amend KRS 248.723 to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to reports submitted to the Legislative Research Commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-26 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2014-03-25 | Senate | received in Senate |
2014-03-24 | House | 3rd reading, passed 99-0 |
2014-03-21 | House | placed in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 24, 2014 |
2014-03-21 | House | taken from Rules |
2014-03-21 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-03-20 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2014-03-18 | House | posted in committee |
2014-02-03 | House | to State Government (H) |
2014-01-31 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/HB313.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/HB313/bill.doc |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/HB313/vote_history.pdf |