KY HB310 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 132)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 132)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 532.245 to allow defendants in the home incarceration program who did not participate in a global positioning monitoring system to receive credit for time served while on pretrial release.
Title
AN ACT relating to home incarceration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2255 (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 53 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 53 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 132) |
2022-03-30 | House | delivered to Governor |
2022-03-30 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2022-03-30 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2022-03-29 | House | received in House |
2022-03-29 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 32-3 |
2022-03-25 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2022-03-24 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2022-03-21 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 24, 2022 |
2022-03-18 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-03-17 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2022-01-31 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2022-01-27 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-01-27 | Senate | received in Senate |
2022-01-26 | House | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 |
2022-01-21 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, January 24, 2022 |
2022-01-20 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-01-19 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2022-01-18 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2022-01-18 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-01-18 | House | introduced in House |