KY HB310 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 175)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 175)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 439.340 to require notice and hearings prior to parole of persons convicted of a Class D felony classified as a sex crime under KRS 17.500; amend KRS 510.037, 456.010, and 403.720 to clarify that inchoate offenses are included in the statutory offenses.
Title
AN ACT relating to crimes and punishments and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 436 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 1809 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 329 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 328 (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 1809 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 329 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 328 (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 175) |
2021-03-30 | House | delivered to Governor |
2021-03-30 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2021-03-30 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2021-03-29 | House | Bill passed 91-0 |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2021-03-29 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2021-03-29 | House | taken from Rules |
2021-03-29 | House | to Rules (H) |
2021-03-29 | House | received in House |
2021-03-29 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0-1 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2021-03-29 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 29, 2021 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) |
2021-03-16 | Senate | returned to Judiciary (S) |
2021-03-16 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2021-03-16 | Senate | taken from Judiciary (S) |
2021-03-15 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2021-03-15 | Senate | returned to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-03-15 | Senate | 1st reading |
2021-03-15 | Senate | taken from Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-03-15 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-03-15 | Senate | received in Senate |
2021-03-15 | House | 3rd reading, passed 96-0 with floor amendments (3) and (4-title) |
2021-03-15 | House | floor amendments (3) and (4-title) filed |
2021-03-12 | House | floor amendments (1) and (2-title) filed |
2021-03-04 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 5, 2021 |
2021-03-04 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-03-03 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2021-03-02 | House | posted in committee |
2021-03-02 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2021-02-02 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-02-02 | House | introduced in House |