KY HB306 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 177)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 141.010 to exclude earnings of a STABLE Kentucky account from adjusted gross income; create a new section of KRS Chapter 164A to define a STABLE Kentucky account.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to STABLE Kentucky accounts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 509 (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SCS 1 RSN# 760 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 261 (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-26Housesigned by Governor (Acts, ch. 177)
2018-04-14Housedelivered to Governor
2018-04-14Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2018-04-14Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2018-04-14HouseBill passed 88-0
2018-04-14HouseHouse concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1)
2018-04-14Houseposted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1)
2018-04-14Housetaken from Rules
2018-04-14Houseto Rules (H)
2018-04-14Housereceived in House
2018-04-14Senatefloor amendment (1-title) and (2) floor amendment (3) filed to Committee Substitute
2018-04-14Senate3rd reading, passed 38-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
2018-04-13Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Saturday, April 14, 2018
2018-03-29Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2018-03-27Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2018-03-13Senateto Appropriations & Revenue (S)
2018-03-12Senatereceived in Senate
2018-03-09House3rd reading, passed 84-0
2018-03-08Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 9, 2018
2018-03-07House2nd reading, to Rules
2018-03-06Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2018-02-08Houseposted in committee
2018-02-07Houseto Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2018-02-05Houseintroduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback