KY HB305 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-15 - Conference Committee appointed in House
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #5) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-15 - Conference Committee appointed in House
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #5) [PDF]
Summary
Set out the fiscal year 2016-2018 Biennial Highway Construction Plan; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to road projects and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Rand [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-15 | House | Conference Committee appointed in House |
2016-04-01 | House | to Rules (H) |
2016-04-01 | House | received in House |
2016-03-29 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 34-4 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2016-03-29 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 29, 2016 |
2016-03-28 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) |
2016-03-24 | Senate | to Transportation (S) |
2016-03-24 | Senate | returned to Committee on Committees (S) |
2016-03-24 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2016-03-24 | Senate | taken from Committee on Committees (S) |
2016-03-23 | Senate | returned to Committee on Committees (S) |
2016-03-23 | Senate | 1st reading |
2016-03-23 | Senate | taken from Committee on Committees (S) |
2016-03-23 | Senate | received in Senate |
2016-03-22 | House | 3rd reading, passed 56-40 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2016-03-22 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day |
2016-03-22 | House | taken from Rules |
2016-03-22 | House | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) |
2016-03-10 | House | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2016-03-09 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-08 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2016-02-26 | House | posted in committee |
2016-01-28 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2016-01-27 | House | introduced in House |