KY HB304 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-21 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 084)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-21 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 084)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 314 to enact and enter into the Nurse Licensure Compact with all other jurisdictions that legally join in the compact; declare the purpose of the compact; define terms; recognize a multistate licensure privilege to practice for registered nurses or practical nurses; permit the Kentucky Board of Nursing to limit or revoke the multistate licensure privilege of any nurse to practice in Kentucky; establish application requirements; require reporting of any actions taken by the Kentucky Board of Nursing to the home state of the licensee; require compact states to participate in a coordinated licensure information system and provide for interchange of information; establish the Interstate Commission of Nurse Licensure Compact Administrators; provide immunity for party states, officers, employees, or agents of a party state's nurse licensing board who act in accordance with the provisions of the compact; prohibit amendment of the compact unless the amendment has been enacted into the laws of all party states; provide for severability for any provision in the compact that is contrary to the constitution of any party state or of the United States or the applicability thereof to any government, agency, person, or circumstance; repeal KRS 314.470, which set forth the prior version of the Nurse Licensure Compact; EFFECTIVE December 31, 2018, or upon adoption of compact by 26 states, whichever is earlier.
Title
AN ACT relating to the nurse licensure compact.
Sponsors
Rep. Addia Wuchner [R] | Rep. Mary Marzian [D] | Rep. Kelly Flood [D] | Rep. Mark Hart [R] |
Rep. Kimberly Moser [R] | Rep. Ruth Palumbo [D] | Rep. Melinda Prunty [R] | Rep. Susan Westrom [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-21 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 084) |
2017-03-14 | House | delivered to Governor |
2017-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2017-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2017-03-14 | House | received in House |
2017-03-08 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 8, 2017 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2017-03-06 | Senate | returned to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S) |
2017-03-06 | Senate | 1st reading |
2017-03-06 | Senate | taken from Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S) |
2017-02-28 | Senate | to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S) |
2017-02-23 | Senate | received in Senate |
2017-02-22 | House | 3rd reading, passed 99-0 |
2017-02-21 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 22, 2017 |
2017-02-17 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-02-16 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2017-02-15 | House | posted in committee |
2017-02-14 | House | to Health and Family Services (H) |
2017-02-10 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/17RS/HB304.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/HB304/bill.pdf |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/17RS/HB304/vote_history.pdf |