KY HB303 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-27 - line items vetoed (Acts, ch.149)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]

Summary

The State/Executive Branch Budget: appropriate from the General Fund (Tobacco), General Fund, Restricted Funds, Federal Funds, Road Fund, Bond Funds, Agency Bonds, Capital Construction Surplus, Investment Income, Statewide Deferred Maintenance Fund, and other funds, $182,013,700 in fiscal year 2015-2016, $33,287,508,100 in fiscal year 2016-2017, and $32,051,036,100 in fiscal year 2017-2018 as follows:

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to appropriations and revenue measures providing financing and conditions for the operations, maintenance, support, and functioning of the government of the Commonwealth of Kentucky and its various officers, cabinets, departments, boards, commissions, institutions, subdivisions, agencies, and other state-supported activities.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-27Houseline items vetoed (Acts, ch.149)
2016-04-15Housedelivered to Governor
2016-04-15Houseenrolled, signed by each presiding officer
2016-04-15Housepassed 98-1
2016-04-15HouseFree Conference Committee report adopted in House
2016-04-15Housereceived in House
2016-04-15Senatepassed 38-0 with committee title amendment
2016-04-15SenateFree Conference Committee report adopted in Senate
2016-04-15SenateFree Conference Committee report filed in House and Senate
2016-04-15SenateConference Committee report adopted in House and Senate
2016-04-15SenateConference Committee report filed in House and Senate
2016-03-25SenateSenate refused to recede from Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1)
2016-03-25Senateposted for passage for receding from Senate Committee Substitutes (1) committee amendment (1)
2016-03-25Senatereceived in Senate
2016-03-24HouseConference and Free Conference Committees appointed in Senate
2016-03-24HouseConference and Free Conference Committees appointed in House
2016-03-24HouseHouse refused to concur in Senate Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1)
2016-03-24Houseposted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1) for Thursday, March 24, 2016
2016-03-24Housetaken from Rules
2016-03-24Houseto Rules (H)
2016-03-24Housereceived in House
2016-03-23Senate3rd reading, passed 27-2-9 with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1)
2016-03-23Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 23, 2016
2016-03-23Senatereported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1)
2016-03-21Senateto Appropriations & Revenue (S)
2016-03-18Senatereturned to Committee on Committees (S)
2016-03-18Senate2nd reading
2016-03-18Senatetaken from Committee on Committees (S)
2016-03-17Senatereturned to Committee on Committees (S)
2016-03-17Senate1st reading
2016-03-17Senatetaken from Committee on Committees (S)
2016-03-17Senatereceived in Senate
2016-03-16Housepassed 53-0 with Committee Substitute (1), committee amendment (1-title) and floor amendment (10)
2016-03-16Housefloor amendments (5) (8) (9) (11) (12) and (13) ruled in violation of Rule 60
2016-03-16House3rd reading
2016-03-16Housefloor amendment (15) filed to Committee Substitute
2016-03-15Houseplaced in the Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 16, 2016
2016-03-15Housetaken from Rules
2016-03-15Housefloor amendments (5), (6), (7), (8), (9), (10), (11), (12), (13) and (14) filed to Committee Substitute
2016-03-15Housereported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) committee amendments (1-title)
2016-03-14Housefloor amendment (4) filed
2016-03-10Houserecommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2016-03-09House2nd reading, to Rules
2016-03-08Housefloor amendment (3) filed
2016-03-08Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2016-02-26Houseposted in committee
2016-02-24Housefloor amendment (1) and (2) filed
2016-01-28Houseto Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2016-01-27Houseintroduced in House

Kentucky State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/HB303.htm
Texthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/HB303/bill.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/HB303/HFA1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/HB303/HFA2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/HB303/HFA3.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/HB303/HFA4.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/HB303/HCS1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/HB303/HCA1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/HB303/HFA5.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/HB303/HFA6.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/HB303/HFA7.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/HB303/HFA8.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/HB303/HFA9.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/HB303/HFA10.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/HB303/HFA11.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/HB303/HFA12.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/HB303/HFA13.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/HB303/HFA14.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/HB303/HFA15.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/HB303/SCS1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/HB303/SCA1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/HB303/CCR1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/HB303/FCCR1.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/HB303/vote_history.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback