KY HB302 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 176)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 12.020 and 12.252 to create the Professional Licensing Legal Division within the Public Protection Cabinet; create the Office of Administrative Hearings within the Public Protection Cabinet; confirm Executive Order 2017-325.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to reorganization.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 511 (Y: 48 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-04-14 - House - House: Concur SCS 1 RCS# 510 (Y: 47 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SCS 1, SFA 1, SCTA 1 RSN# 660 (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 185 (Y: 82 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-26Housesigned by Governor (Acts, ch. 176)
2018-04-14Housedelivered to Governor
2018-04-14Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2018-04-14Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2018-04-14HouseBill passed 48-39
2018-04-14HouseHouse concurred in Senate Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) and floor amendment (1)
2018-04-13Houseposted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) and floor amendment (1)
2018-03-29Houseto Rules (H)
2018-03-29Housereceived in House
2018-03-29Senate3rd reading, passed 23-9 with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) and floor amendment (1)
2018-03-27Senatefloor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
2018-03-27Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2018-03-22Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2018-03-22Senatetaken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day
2018-03-22Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 22, 2018
2018-03-21Senatereported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitutes (1) committee amendment (1-title) as a consent bill
2018-03-19Senaterecommitted to State & Local Government (S)
2018-03-19Senatetaken from Rules (S)
2018-03-14Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2018-03-13Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2018-02-27Senateto Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S)
2018-02-26Senatereceived in Senate
2018-02-23House3rd reading, passed 82-1
2018-02-22Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 23, 2018
2018-02-16House2nd reading, to Rules
2018-02-15Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2018-02-13Houseposted in committee
2018-02-06Houseto State Government (H)
2018-02-02Houseintroduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback