KY HB301 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-10 - 2nd reading, to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-10 - 2nd reading, to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 156.095 to require the Department of Education to develop and maintain a list of child abuse and neglect prevention, recognition, and reporting training for school administrators, certified personnel, and classified personnel; require local school boards to adopt the developed training.
Title
AN ACT relating to child abuse and neglect prevention, recognition, and reporting training for school personnel.
Sponsors
Rep. Rita Smart [D] | Rep. Linda Belcher [D] | Rep. Ron Crimm [R] | Rep. Chris Harris [D] |
Rep. Mary Marzian [D] | Rep. Charles Miller [D] | Rep. Jody Richards [D] | Rep. Jim Wayne [D] |
Rep. Susan Westrom [D] | Rep. Brent Yonts [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-10 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-03-09 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2015-03-03 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2015-03-02 | Senate | received in Senate |
2015-02-27 | House | passed 94-0 with Committee Substitute |
2015-02-27 | House | floor amendment (2) defeated |
2015-02-27 | House | 3rd reading |
2015-02-26 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 27, 2015 |
2015-02-26 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 27, 2015 |
2015-02-25 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-02-24 | House | floor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute, floor amendment (1) filed |
2015-02-24 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2015-02-23 | House | posting waived |
2015-02-05 | House | to Education (H) |
2015-02-04 | House | introduced in House |