KY HB301 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-25 - delivered to Secretary of State (Acts ch. 128)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]

Summary

Amend KRS 154.60-010 and 154.60-020 to simplify and streamline the provisions of the Small Business Tax Credit Program administered by the Kentucky Economic Development Finance Authority; create a new section of KRS Chapter 154 to declare the name of the program; amend KRS 141.384 to conform.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to the Small Business Tax Credit Program.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-25Housedelivered to Secretary of State (Acts ch. 128)
2014-04-25Houseveto(es) not acted upon
2014-04-25Houseline items vetoed
2014-04-15Housedelivered to Governor
2014-04-15Houseenrolled, signed by each presiding officer
2014-04-15Housepassed 85-11
2014-04-15HouseHouse concurred in Senate committee amendments (1) (2) (3) and (4-title)
2014-04-15Houseposted for passage for concurrence in Senate committee amendments (1) (2) (3) and (4-title)
2014-04-15Houseto Rules (H)
2014-04-15Housereceived in House
2014-04-15Senatepassed 37-1 with committee amendments (1) (2) (3) and (4-title)
2014-04-15Senatefloor amendments (1-title) and (2) withdrawn
2014-04-15Senate3rd reading
2014-04-15Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, April 15, 2014
2014-04-15Senatereported favorably, to Rules with committee amendments (1) (2) (3) and (4-title) as a Consent Bill
2014-04-15Senaterecommitted to Transportation (S)
2014-04-15Senatetaken from the Regular Orders of the Day
2014-04-14Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2014-04-14Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, April 14, 2014
2014-03-31Senatefloor amendments (1-title) and (2) filed
2014-03-27Senatereported favorably, to Rules as a Consent Bill
2014-03-24Senatereturned to Economic Development, Tourism & Labor (S)
2014-03-24Senate2nd reading
2014-03-24Senatetaken from Economic Development, Tourism & Labor (S)
2014-03-21Senatereturned to Economic Development, Tourism & Labor (S)
2014-03-21Senate1st reading
2014-03-21Senatetaken from Economic Development, Tourism & Labor (S)
2014-02-26Senateto Economic Development, Tourism & Labor (S)
2014-02-24Senatereceived in Senate
2014-02-21House3rd reading, passed 97-0
2014-02-14Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 21, 2014
2014-02-14House2nd reading, to Rules
2014-02-13Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2014-02-10Houseposted in committee
2014-02-03Houseto Economic Development (H)
2014-01-30Houseintroduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback