KY HB3 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Vetoed on January 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-20 - Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS Chapter 452 to establish the venue for constitutional challenges to statutes, executive orders, regulations, and other cabinet or department orders; establish procedures for selecting a panel of three Circuit Judges to hear challenges; establish three districts from which panel judges can be selected; amend various sections to conform; EMERGENCY.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to civil actions and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-13 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 32 (Y: 72 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 1513 (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 13 (Y: 69 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-20HouseVetoed
2021-01-13Housedelivered to Governor
2021-01-13Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2021-01-13Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2021-01-13Housepassed 72-20
2021-01-13HouseHouse concurred in Senate Committee Subsitute
2021-01-13Houseplaced in the Orders of the Day for concurrence or non-concurrence
2021-01-13Housetaken from Rules
2021-01-13Houseto Rules (H)
2021-01-13Housereceived in House
2021-01-13Senate3rd reading, passed 28-6 with Committee Substitute (1)
2021-01-13Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, January 13, 2021
2021-01-12Senatereported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1)
2021-01-08Senatereturned to Judiciary (S)
2021-01-08Senate2nd reading
2021-01-08Senatetaken from Judiciary (S)
2021-01-07Senatereturned to Judiciary (S)
2021-01-07Senate1st reading
2021-01-07Senatetaken from Judiciary (S)
2021-01-07Senateto Judiciary (S)
2021-01-07Senateto Committee on Committees (S)
2021-01-07Senatereceived in Senate
2021-01-07House3rd reading, passed 69-24
2021-01-06Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, January 7, 2021
2021-01-06Housereported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules
2021-01-05Houseposting waived
2021-01-05Housereturned to Judiciary (H)
2021-01-05House1st reading
2021-01-05Housetaken from Judiciary (H)
2021-01-05Houseto Judiciary (H)
2021-01-05Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback