KY HB3 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Create new sections of KRS Chapter 411 to lift the statute of limitations for certain lawsuits where comparative fault is an issue; extend the statute of limitations for one year for plaintiffs who submit claims regarding long-term-care facilities to an evaluation process; exempt passive investors from liability in claims against long-term-care facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to civil justice reform.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 263 (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-19Senateto Judiciary (S)
2020-03-19Senatereceived in Senate
2020-03-18House3rd reading, passed 81-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (2)
2020-03-17Housefloor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute
2020-03-12Housefloor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
2020-03-12Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 17, 2020
2020-03-12House2nd reading, to Rules
2020-03-11Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2020-03-09Houseposted in committee
2020-03-02Houseto Judiciary (H)
2020-02-26Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback