KY HB3 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Passed on April 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 158)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Passed on April 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 158)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 158 to require, beginning with the 2019-2020 school year, each school to provide an essential skills curriculum to students; amend KRS 158.645 to conform; create a new section of KRS Chapter 158 to create the Council on Essential Skills; amend KRS 158.6453 to require the Council on Essential Skills to serve as a review committee for career studies; require the department to include the essential skills program on the school profile report; amend KRS 158.6457 to include work ethics certification in the definition of nonacademic factors; create a new section of KRS Chapter 158 requiring the Kentucky Department of Education to develop an age-appropriate drug awareness and prevention program; require local school boards to ensure that students receive annual instruction in drug awareness and prevention.
Title
AN ACT relating to school curriculum.
Sponsors
Rep. Jonathan Shell [R] | Rep. John Sims [D] | Rep. John Carney [R] | Rep. Jeff Greer [D] |
Rep. Mark Hart [R] | Rep. Richard Heath [R] | Rep. Mary Marzian [D] | Rep. David Osborne [R] |
Rep. Phillip Pratt [R] | Rep. Jody Richards [D] | Rep. Bart Rowland [R] | Rep. Sal Santoro [R] |
Rep. Dean Schamore [D] | Rep. James Tipton [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 463 (Y: 85 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SCS 1, SCTA 1 RSN# 696 (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 118 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SCS 1, SCTA 1 RSN# 696 (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 118 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-13 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 158) |
2018-04-02 | House | delivered to Governor |
2018-04-02 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2018-04-02 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2018-04-02 | House | Bill passed 85-2 |
2018-04-02 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) committee amendment (1-title) |
2018-04-02 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title) |
2018-04-02 | House | taken from Rules |
2018-04-02 | House | to Rules (H) |
2018-04-02 | House | received in House |
2018-04-02 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 35-2 with Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title) |
2018-03-29 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, April 2, 2018 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title) |
2018-03-21 | Senate | returned to Education (S) |
2018-03-21 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2018-03-21 | Senate | taken from Education (S) |
2018-03-20 | Senate | returned to Education (S) |
2018-03-20 | Senate | 1st reading |
2018-03-20 | Senate | taken from Education (S) |
2018-02-16 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2018-02-13 | Senate | received in Senate |
2018-02-12 | House | 3rd reading, passed 91-0 with floor amendments (1) and (2) |
2018-02-08 | House | floor amendment (1) and (2) filed |
2018-02-07 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 8, 2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-02-06 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2018-02-02 | House | posted in committee |
2018-02-02 | House | to Education (H) |
2018-01-31 | House | introduced in House |