KY HB3 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Passed on January 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-09 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 003)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

Amend various KRS sections to delete prevailing wage provisions; abolish the Prevailing Wage Review Board; make conforming amendments; create new section of KRS Chapter 65 to prohibit local governments from requiring employers to pay prevailing wage to employees; repeal KRS 337.505, 337.510, 337.512, 337.520, 337.522, 337.524, 337.525, 337.530, 337.540, 337.548, and 337.550, relating to prevailing wages in public works; apply this repeal to public works projects for which bids have not yet been awarded as of the effective date of the Act; EMERGENCY.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to prevailing wage and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-09Senatesigned by Governor (Acts, ch. 003)
2017-01-07Senatedelivered to Governor
2017-01-07Senateenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2017-01-07Senatereceived in Senate
2017-01-07Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2017-01-07Housereceived in House
2017-01-07Senate3rd reading, passed 25-12
2017-01-07Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Saturday, January 7, 2017
2017-01-07Senatereported favorably, to Rules
2017-01-06Senatereturned to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
2017-01-06Senate2nd reading
2017-01-06Senatetaken from Appropriations & Revenue (S)
2017-01-05Senatereturned to Committee on Committees (S)
2017-01-05Senate1st reading
2017-01-05Senatetaken from Committee on Committees (S)
2017-01-05Senatereceived in Senate
2017-01-05House3rd reading, passed 57-40
2017-01-05Housefloor amendments (1) and (2-title) filed
2017-01-04Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, January 5, 2017
2017-01-04Housereported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules
2017-01-03Houseposting waived
2017-01-03Housereturned to Economic Development & Workforce Investment (H)
2017-01-03House1st reading
2017-01-03Housetaken from Economic Development & Workforce Investment (H)
2017-01-03Houseto Economic Development & Workforce Investment (H)
2017-01-03Houseintroduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback