KY HB299 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-25 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 67)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-25 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 67)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 132.380 to clarify that, if a second property valuation administrator exam within a county is necessary, notice shall be made by issuing a press release in that county and by posting an announcement on the Web site of the Department of Revenue; amend KRS 133.020 to allow for an authorized person other than the county judge/executive to swear in a new member of the local board of assessment appeals; amend KRS 133.120 to clarify that real estate appraisers may represent a property owner in assessment appeals; amend KRS 136.180 to clarify that common carrier water transportation companies are taxed as public service corporations under KRS 136.1801 to 136.1805; amend KRS 136.1877 to make conforming changes; amend KRS 136.310 to clarify that the total value of bank deposits maintained in Kentucky shall be determined by the same method used for filing the summary of deposits report with the Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation for purposes of the foreign savings and loan tax; amend KRS 136.555 to correct a statutory reference related to the local government franchise tax on bank deposits; amend KRS 138.330 to clarify that a financial instrument is an acceptable form of surety for motor fuels taxes; amend KRS 138.460 to conform to finalized litigation related to the return of a motor vehicle to a dealer within 60 days; amend KRS 138.4603 to remove an incorrect formula for determining the retail price of a new vehicle; amend KRS 131.183 to base the annual adjustment of the tax interest rate on prime rate charged by banks in September rather than October; amend KRS 141.180 to make approvals of innocent spouse relief effective as of the date that the relief is approved by the Internal Revenue Service or the department, and to allow for payments made after the effective date of the relief to be refunded as applicable; make various other technical corrections.
Title
AN ACT relating to taxation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-25 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 67) |
2015-03-25 | House | delivered to Governor |
2015-03-25 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2015-03-25 | House | Bill passed 67-29 |
2015-03-25 | House | Free Conference Committee report adopted in House |
2015-03-24 | House | received in House |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Bill passed 29-9 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Free Conference Committee report adopted in Senate |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Free Conference Committee report filed in House and Senate |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Free Conference Committee appointed in House and Senate |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Conference Committee report adopted in House and Senate |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Conference Committee report filed in House and Senate |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Conference Committee appointed in House |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Conference Committee appointed in Senate |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Senate refused to recede from Committee Substitute |
2015-03-11 | Senate | posted for passage for receding from Senate Committee Substitute |
2015-03-11 | Senate | to Rules (S) |
2015-03-11 | Senate | received in Senate |
2015-03-11 | House | House refused to concur in Senate Committee Substitute |
2015-03-11 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute |
2015-03-11 | House | to Rules (H) |
2015-03-11 | House | received in House |
2015-03-11 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 34-2 with Committee Substitute |
2015-03-11 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 11, 2015 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute as a Consent Bill |
2015-03-09 | Senate | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2015-03-09 | Senate | 1st reading |
2015-03-09 | Senate | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2015-03-03 | Senate | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2015-03-02 | Senate | received in Senate |
2015-03-02 | House | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 |
2015-02-27 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day |
2015-02-27 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 2, 2015 |
2015-02-27 | House | reported favorably, to Rules as a Consent Bill |
2015-02-26 | House | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2015-02-26 | House | 2nd reading |
2015-02-26 | House | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2015-02-25 | House | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2015-02-25 | House | 1st reading |
2015-02-25 | House | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2015-02-13 | House | posted in committee |
2015-02-05 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2015-02-04 | House | introduced in House |