KY HB296 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-03-07 - returned to Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S)
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 342.020 to limit the obligation to pay medical benefits indefinitely for certain permanent partial disabilities; limit medical benefits to age 70 or four years after date of injury, whichever is later, except for permanent total awards or awards involving prosthetic devices which continue for as long as the employee is disabled; limit the number of urine drug screens for which an employer, insurer, or payment obligor is required to pay; amend KRS 342.035 to require the commissioner of the Department of Workers' Claims to develop, adopt, and implement treatment guidelines and a pharmaceutical formulary on or before December 31, 2018; amend KRS 342.040 to reduce the amount of interest paid on awards; amend KRS 342.125 to clarify that the four-year reopening window begins only from the date of the original order granting or denying benefits; amend KRS 342.185 to provide a statute of repose for cumulative trauma claims; amend KRS 342.320 to increase limitation on attorney's fees to $18,000; amend KRS 342.700 to extend subrogation recovery of medical expenses and delete reference to legal fees and expense; amend KRS 342.730 to allow payment of temporary total disability benefits to be offset for net wages paid to an employee during a period of light-duty work or work in an alternative job position; amend KRS 342.990 to conform; specify the applicability of substantive changes to claims arising on or after effective date of Act and remedial changes to all claims irrespective of injury date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to workers' compensation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-07Senatereturned to Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S)
2017-03-07Senate2nd reading
2017-03-07Senatetaken from Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S)
2017-03-06Senatereturned to Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S)
2017-03-06Senate1st reading
2017-03-06Senatetaken from Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S)
2017-02-24Senateto Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S)
2017-02-23Senatereceived in Senate
2017-02-22Housepassed 58-40 with floor amendments (1) (3) and (4)
2017-02-22Housefloor amendment (2) defeated
2017-02-22House3rd reading
2017-02-21Housefloor amendments (2) and (3) and (4) filed
2017-02-21Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 22, 2017
2017-02-17House2nd reading, to Rules
2017-02-16Housefloor amendment (1) filed
2017-02-16Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2017-02-15Houseposted in committee
2017-02-14Houseto Economic Development & Workforce Investment (H)
2017-02-10Houseintroduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback