KY HB293 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS Chapter 217 to define terms related to kratom; direct the Department of Alcoholic Beverage Control to license and regulate processors and retailers of kratom products; charge kratom processors an annual licensing fee of $1,000 and kratom retailers an annual licensing fee of $500; prohibit the manufacture and sale of certain kratom extracts and kratom products; prohibit the sale of kratom extracts and kratom products to any individuals under 21 years of age; establish penalties; declare the supremacy of any future federal regulations on kratom.
Title
AN ACT relating to kratom.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 384 (Y: 81 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 3057 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 127 (Y: 87 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 3057 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 127 (Y: 87 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | House | signed by Governor |
2024-03-28 | House | delivered to Governor |
2024-03-28 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2024-03-27 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2024-03-27 | House | passed 81-6 |
2024-03-27 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-27 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-26 | House | to Rules (H) |
2024-03-26 | House | received in House |
2024-03-26 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-26 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 26, 2024 |
2024-03-25 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2024-03-22 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-01 | Senate | to Health Services (S) |
2024-02-22 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-02-22 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-02-21 | House | 3rd reading, passed 87-7 with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2024-02-20 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 21, 2024 |
2024-02-16 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-02-15 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2024-01-31 | House | to Health Services (H) |
2024-01-17 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-01-17 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative Regulations and Proceedings
Children and Minors
Consumer Affairs
Fees
Foods
Licensing
Public Health
Safety
State Agencies
Trade Practices and Retailing
Children and Minors
Consumer Affairs
Fees
Foods
Licensing
Public Health
Safety
State Agencies
Trade Practices and Retailing