KY HB291 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-29 - floor amendment (3) filed to Committee Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 446.010 to define "drone"; create a new section of KRS Chapter 500 prescribe permitted and prohibited uses of drones; provide exceptions; prohibit use of evidence obtained by a drone in violation of stated prohibitions; authorize that section of the bill to be cited as the "Citizens' Freedom from Unwarranted Surveillance Act"; create a new section of KRS Chapter 501 to clarify criminal liability for offenses committed using a drone; create a new section of KRS Chapter 525 to create the offense of obstructing an emergency responder; create new section of KRS Chapter 511 to create offense of trespass on critical infrastructure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to public safety.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-29Senatefloor amendment (3) filed to Committee Substitute
2017-03-15Senatefloor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute
2017-03-14Senatefloor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
2017-03-14Senatereported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute
2017-03-07Senatereturned to Judiciary (S)
2017-03-07Senate2nd reading
2017-03-07Senatetaken from Judiciary (S)
2017-03-06Senatereturned to Judiciary (S)
2017-03-06Senate1st reading
2017-03-06Senatetaken from Judiciary (S)
2017-02-24Senateto Judiciary (S)
2017-02-23Senatereceived in Senate
2017-02-22House3rd reading, passed 99-0 with Committee Substitute
2017-02-21Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 22, 2017
2017-02-17House2nd reading, to Rules
2017-02-16Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute
2017-02-15Houseposted in committee
2017-02-14Houseto Small Business & Information Technology (H)
2017-02-10Houseintroduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback