KY HB289 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 76)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 76)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 205.639 to establish definitions; amend KRS 205.640 to specify the process for submitting Medicaid disproportionate share hospital (DSH) surveys; specify the process by which initial and final DSH payments are calculated; provide for the distribution of DSH funds; require the Department for Medicaid Services and managed care organizations to provide hospitals with a paid claims list within 90 days of the end of each hospital's fiscal year; create a new section of KRS Chapter 205 to establish a penalty for managed care organizations that do not provide hospitals with a paid claims list by the required deadline; create a new section of KRS Chapter 205 to permit the Department for Medicaid Services to promulgate administrative regulations to comply with changes in federal law regarding DSH payments and to make DSH payments contingent upon receipt of federal funds, the availability of state funds, and approval of the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid; repeal KRS 205.641; APPROPRIATION.
Title
AN ACT relating to disproportionate share hospital payments and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 605 (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 158 (Y: 84 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House: Adopt HFA 1 RCS# 157 (Y: 40 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2018-02-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 158 (Y: 84 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House: Adopt HFA 1 RCS# 157 (Y: 40 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-02 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 76) |
2018-03-22 | House | delivered to Governor |
2018-03-22 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2018-03-22 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2018-03-22 | House | received in House |
2018-03-21 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 33-2 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 21, 2018 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-03-14 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2018-02-23 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2018-02-22 | Senate | received in Senate |
2018-02-21 | House | passed 84-11 |
2018-02-21 | House | floor amendment (1) defeated |
2018-02-21 | House | 3rd reading |
2018-02-20 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 21, 2018 |
2018-02-16 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-02-15 | House | floor amendment filed |
2018-02-15 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2018-02-13 | House | posted in committee |
2018-02-06 | House | posted in committee |
2018-02-02 | House | to Health and Family Services (H) |
2018-01-31 | House | introduced in House |