KY HB289 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 38)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 38)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Confirm Executive Order 2016-902, dated December 19, 2016, reorganizing the Justice and Public Safety Cabinet's Department of Criminal Justice Training; amend KRS 15A.020 and KRS 15A.030 to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to reorganization.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-20 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 38) |
2017-03-08 | House | delivered to Governor |
2017-03-08 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2017-03-07 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2017-03-06 | House | received in House |
2017-03-06 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 |
2017-03-06 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 6, 2017 |
2017-03-03 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-03-02 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2017-02-24 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2017-02-23 | Senate | received in Senate |
2017-02-22 | House | 3rd reading, passed 94-0 |
2017-02-22 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day |
2017-02-21 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 22, 2017 |
2017-02-17 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-02-16 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2017-02-14 | House | posted in committee |
2017-02-13 | House | to State Government (H) |
2017-02-09 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/17RS/HB289.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/HB289/bill.pdf |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/17RS/HB289/vote_history.pdf |