KY HB288 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-26 - to Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H)
Pending: House Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-26 - to Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H)
Pending: House Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 121.120 to exempt audits for candidates and slates of candidates that receive or spend less than the threshhold amount; allow Registry of Election Finance to develop system that provides for submission of reports on-line or electronically with security procedures; amend KRS 121.150 to allow acceptance of contributions after date of primary or election to retire debts and to provide period to refund prohibited funds; amend KRS 121.180 to increase campaign finance reporting exemptions; amend to remove certain media from reporting certain contributions; amend supplemental reporting dates, and allow permissive electronic reporting; create a new section of KRS Chapter 121 to allow credit card, debit card, electronic transfer, and other electronic transactions for campaign purposes, and require the registry to adopt reporting forms and promulgate administrative regulations to implement; create a new section of KRS Chapter 121 to require the registry to promulgate administrative regulations to allow minor reporting discrepancies to not require an amended report until the next regularly scheduled reporting date.
Title
AN ACT relating to campaign finance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-26 | to Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H) | |
2010-03-19 | to Rules (H) | |
2010-03-19 | received in House | |
2010-03-18 | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute | |
2010-03-17 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 18, 2010 | |
2010-03-11 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-03-10 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute | |
2010-03-08 | to State & Local Government (S) | |
2010-03-04 | received in Senate | |
2010-03-03 | 3rd reading, passed 99-0 | |
2010-02-24 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 3, 2010 | |
2010-02-24 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-02-23 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2010-02-04 | posted in committee | |
2010-01-21 | to Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H) | |
2010-01-20 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB288.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB288/bill.doc |