KY HB286 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-16 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-16 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of Subtitle 17A of KRS Chapter 304 to require insurers and any exchange to provide a special enrollment period for pregnant individuals; specify requirements for the coverage; require group plan insurers to provide notice of special enrollment rights; amend KRS 304.17A-145 to require health benefit plans that provide coverage for dependents to provide coverage for maternity care; amend KRS 304.17A-220 and 194A.099 to conform with special enrollment requirement; amend KRS 18A.225 and 164.2871 to require the state employee health plan and self-insured state postsecondary education institution group health plans to comply with the special enrollment and maternity coverage requirements; amend KRS 205.592 to allow Medicaid income limit for certain women and children to be increased under certain circumstances; EFFECTIVE, in part, January 1, 2024.
Title
AN ACT relating to coverage for health care.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-16 | House | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2023-03-16 | House | taken from Rules |
2023-03-15 | House | reported favorably, to Rules |
2023-03-14 | House | returned to Banking & Insurance (H) |
2023-03-14 | House | 2nd reading |
2023-03-14 | House | taken from Banking & Insurance (H) |
2023-03-13 | House | returned to Banking & Insurance (H) |
2023-03-13 | House | 1st reading |
2023-03-13 | House | taken from Banking & Insurance (H) |
2023-03-07 | House | to Banking & Insurance (H) |
2023-02-14 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2023-02-14 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Education, Higher
Effective Dates, Delayed
Health Benefit Mandate
Insurance, Health
Medicaid
State Employees
Women
Effective Dates, Delayed
Health Benefit Mandate
Insurance, Health
Medicaid
State Employees
Women
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/23RS/hb286.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/23RS/hb286/orig_bill.pdf |