KY HB285 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - posting withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - posting withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 508 to define "female genital mutilation" and create the Class B felony of female genital mutilation; create a new section of KRS Chapter 211 to require the Department for Public Health in the Cabinet for Health and Family Services to develop, produce, and disseminate educational materials related to female genital mutilation; amend KRS 15.334 to require law enforcement training on female genital mutilation; amend KRS 311.595 to require a conviction of female genital mutilation to result in mandatory revocation of a physician's license; create a new section of KRS Chapter 413 to permit civil action for female genital mutilation for ten years; amend KRS 620.020 to include female genital mutilation in the definition of "abused or neglected child"; amend KRS 620.030 to provide that if a person knows or has reasonable cause to believe that a child is a victim of female genital mutilation, then that person shall immediately make an oral or written report to the appropriate authorities; create a new section of KRS Chapter 620 to require a report on female genital mutilation reports to the Cabinet for Health and Family Services; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to female genital mutilation.
Sponsors
Rep. Nancy Tate [R] | Rep. Tina Bojanowski [D] | Rep. Kim King [R] | Rep. Ruth Palumbo [D] |
Rep. Maria Sorolis [D] | Rep. Susan Westrom [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | House | posting withdrawn |
2020-01-31 | House | posted in committee |
2020-01-21 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2020-01-16 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Children and Minors
Civil Actions
Crimes and Punishments
Effective Dates, Emergency
Parental Rights
Peace Officers and Law Enforcement
Physicians and Practitioners
Public Health
Reports Mandated
Reproductive Issues
Women
Civil Actions
Crimes and Punishments
Effective Dates, Emergency
Parental Rights
Peace Officers and Law Enforcement
Physicians and Practitioners
Public Health
Reports Mandated
Reproductive Issues
Women
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/20RS/hb285.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/20RS/hb285/orig_bill.pdf |