KY HB282 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 167)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 167)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Amend various sections of the Kentucky Revised Statutes to rename the Department for Public Advocacy as the Department of Public Advocacy; confirm Executive Order 2016-901.
Title
AN ACT relating to reorganization.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 167) |
2017-03-30 | House | delivered to Governor |
2017-03-30 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2017-03-30 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2017-03-30 | House | Bill passed 61-31 |
2017-03-30 | House | House concurred in Senate floor amendments (1), (2-title) and (3) |
2017-03-30 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate floor amendments (1), (2-title) and (3) |
2017-03-30 | House | to Rules (H) |
2017-03-30 | House | received in House |
2017-03-30 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 35-2-1 with floor amendments (1), (2-title) and (3) |
2017-03-29 | Senate | floor amendment (3) filed |
2017-03-29 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 30, 2017 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | floor amendments (1) and (2-title) filed |
2017-03-07 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-03-06 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2017-02-24 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2017-02-23 | Senate | received in Senate |
2017-02-22 | House | 3rd reading, passed 94-0 |
2017-02-22 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day |
2017-02-21 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 22, 2017 |
2017-02-17 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-02-16 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2017-02-14 | House | posted in committee |
2017-02-13 | House | to State Government (H) |
2017-02-09 | House | introduced in House |