KY HB276 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-18 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 15)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-18 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 15)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of Subchapter 10 of KRS Chapter 224 to establish a procedure for small independent occupational or professional boards and commissions to utilize the administrative services of the Division of Occupations and Professions; make any new independent occupational or professional boards use the division's services unless the board or commission can demonstrate to the division that it will regulate more than 100 persons; require that both new and existing independent occupational and professional boards submit a report to the division and to the Licensing and Occupations Committee if the board fails to regulate at least 100 persons for two consecutive fiscal years; include the number of persons regulated and a detailed financial accounting for the board for each of the two fiscal years in the report; direct the board to either outline its plan to increase its regulated community alone or through merger with another state board or entity to meet the 100 person threshold or allow the division to assume its administrative duties; direct a board or commission that fails to regulate 100 persons for five consecutive fiscal years to either allow the division to assume its administrative duties or submit a report to the division and to the Licensing and Occupations Committee stating whether or not the board wishes to be disbanded and have its enabling statutes repealed; give the board the burden of proving why it should not be disbanded after the five-year review; amend KRS 224.10-052 to expand the administrative services provided by the Division of Occupations and Professions to include those brought about by the two-year and five-year independent board and commission threshold analysis.
Title
AN ACT relating to boards and commissions.
Sponsors
Rep. Larry Clark [D] | Rep. Dennis Keene [D] | Rep. Adam Koenig [R] | Rep. David Osborne [R] |
Rep. Arnold Simpson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-18 | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 15) | |
2010-03-11 | delivered to Governor | |
2010-03-11 | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate | |
2010-03-10 | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House | |
2010-03-10 | received in House | |
2010-03-10 | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 | |
2010-03-09 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 10, 2010 | |
2010-03-04 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-03-03 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | |
2010-02-24 | to State & Local Government (S) | |
2010-02-22 | received in Senate | |
2010-02-19 | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 with Committee Substitute, floor amendment (1) | |
2010-02-09 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 10, 2010 | |
2010-02-08 | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute | |
2010-02-05 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-02-04 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute | |
2010-01-26 | posted in committee | |
2010-01-19 | to State Government (H) | |
2010-01-15 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB276.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB276/bill.doc |