KY HB273 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-24 - to Banking & Insurance (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-24 - to Banking & Insurance (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 311A to require the Kentucky Board of Emergency Medical Services to annually obtain charges billed by all air ambulance providers licensed and operating in the state; deem the information provided as proprietary and not subject to the Open Records Act, KRS 61.872 to 61.884; require the board to determine the average cost of air ambulance services in the state which shall be subject to the Open Records Act; require the board to submit the average cost to the commissioner of the Department of Insurance; authorize the board to promulgate administrative regulations to establish a form to be completed by all air ambulance service providers to determine average cost of services; amend KRS 311A.190 to require any air ambulance service providers licensed and operating in the state to provide information regarding charges billed to the board; create a new section of Subtitle 17A of KRS Chapter 304 to require health benefit plans to prominently provide a notice in each contract for coverage stating whether or not the contract covers air ambulance service and, if provided, the dollar amount of coverage; require the commissioner of the Department of Insurance to review all health benefit plans for compliance with the notice requirement and provide the average cost of all ambulance services to all health benefit plans every three years.
Title
AN ACT relating to emergency air ambulance services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-24 | Senate | to Banking & Insurance (S) |
2016-03-22 | Senate | received in Senate |
2016-03-21 | House | 3rd reading, passed 97-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2016-03-17 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 18, 2016 |
2016-03-17 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-16 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2016-01-27 | House | floor amendment (1) and (2-title) filed |
2016-01-21 | House | posted in committee |
2016-01-20 | House | to Banking & Insurance (H) |
2016-01-19 | House | introduced in House |