KY HB269 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 37)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 37)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 160.380 to allow relatives who are currently ineligible for employment in a school district to serve as substitutes.
Title
AN ACT relating to substitutes for certified and classified school personnel.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Riley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-20 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 37) |
2017-03-08 | House | delivered to Governor |
2017-03-08 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2017-03-07 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2017-03-07 | House | received in House |
2017-03-07 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 35-3 |
2017-03-06 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 7, 2017 |
2017-03-03 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-03-02 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2017-02-24 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2017-02-23 | Senate | received in Senate |
2017-02-22 | House | 3rd reading, passed 99-0 |
2017-02-21 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 22, 2017 |
2017-02-21 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-02-17 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2017-02-16 | House | posted in committee |
2017-02-16 | House | posting waived |
2017-02-13 | House | to Education (H) |
2017-02-08 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/17RS/HB269.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/HB269/bill.pdf |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/17RS/HB269/vote_history.pdf |